There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Popular Titles

Same Sex Marriage resolution (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Marriage Protection Amendment

Short Titles as Introduced

Marriage Protection Amendment

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to marriage.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/18/2006Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Specter without amendment. Without written report.
01/24/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date
06/07/2006Cloture on the motion to proceed not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 48. Record Vote Number: 163. (consideration: CR S5534)
Action By: Senate
06/07/2006Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5517-5534)
Action By: Senate
06/06/2006Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5439-5484)
Action By: Senate
06/05/2006Cloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S5424; text: CR S5424)
Action By: Senate
06/05/2006Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5401, S5403-5424)
Action By: Senate
05/26/2006Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5393-5394)
Action By: Senate
05/18/2006Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 435.
Action By: Senate
05/18/2006Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Specter without amendment. Without written report.
05/18/2006Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/09/2005Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights and Property Rights. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights and Property Rights
01/24/2005Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S366)
Action By: Senate
01/24/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S365-366)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/24/2005 Referred to
05/18/2006 Markup by
05/18/2006 Reported by
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights and Property Rights11/09/2005 Markup by
11/09/2005 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.1. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (05/18/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Constitutional Amendment - Marriage Protection Amendment - Declares that: (1) marriage in the United States shall consist only of the union of a man and a woman; and (2) neither the U.S. Constitution nor the constitution of any state shall be construed to require that marriage or the legal incidents of marriage be conferred upon any other union.