Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/14/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/14/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 04/14/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/14/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/19/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/06/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/07/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/23/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/23/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/28/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/11/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/22/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/12/2006