Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/19/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/21/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/25/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/09/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/11/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/21/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/28/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/30/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/11/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/11/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/29/2005