Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 09/27/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 09/27/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/29/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/29/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/05/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/06/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 10/17/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/17/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 10/18/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/14/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/06/2006