There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution approving the location of the commemorative work in the District of Columbia honoring former President Dwight D. Eisenhower.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
05/05/2006Became Public Law No: 109-220. (TXT | PDF)
05/05/2006Signed by President.
04/27/2006Presented to President.
04/25/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 100).(text: CR H1687)
04/04/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2845-2846; text: CR S2846)
04/03/2006Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment and with a preamble. With written report No. 109-227.
02/07/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
05/05/2006Became Public Law No: 109-220. (TXT | PDF)
05/05/2006Signed by President.
04/27/2006SenatePresented to President.
04/25/2006-6:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/25/2006-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 100). (text: CR H1687)
04/25/2006-6:33pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1703-1704)
04/25/2006-2:31pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/25/2006-2:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S.J. Res. 28.
04/25/2006-2:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1687-1688)
04/25/2006-2:28pmHouseMr. Renzi moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
04/04/2006-9:16pmHouseHeld at the desk.
04/04/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/04/2006-8:14pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/04/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2845-2846; text: CR S2846)
04/03/2006SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 386.
04/03/2006SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment and with a preamble. With written report No. 109-227.
03/08/2006SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/16/2006SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 109-361.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
02/07/2006SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/07/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/07/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/07/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/07/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/13/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/08/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/07/2006 Referred to
03/08/2006 Markup by
04/03/2006 Reported by S. Rept. 109-227
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks02/16/2006 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.J.Res.28. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-220 (05/05/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Approves the location on federal land within the District of Columbia recommended by the Secretary of the Interior for the commemorative work to honor Dwight D. Eisenhower.