Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/12/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/12/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/12/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/12/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/12/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/18/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/25/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/14/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/25/2005