Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 10/19/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 10/25/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/26/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 10/26/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/01/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/04/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/04/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 11/08/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/09/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/15/2005