Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/18/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 12/12/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 12/12/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/12/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/12/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/13/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/13/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 12/13/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 12/15/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/15/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/15/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/15/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/15/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 12/15/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/15/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 12/16/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 12/16/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/16/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/20/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/18/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/25/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 01/25/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 01/30/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/02/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/08/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/14/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/26/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/26/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/08/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/08/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/09/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/09/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/16/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/25/2006