Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 02/07/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/07/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/17/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 02/17/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/17/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 02/17/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/17/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/17/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/28/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/28/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/07/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/07/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/07/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/07/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/07/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/07/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/08/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/08/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/08/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/09/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/09/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/09/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 06/09/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/09/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/09/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/09/2005
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/13/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/13/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/13/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/13/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/13/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/13/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/13/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/13/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/13/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/13/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/13/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/13/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/13/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/13/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/13/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/14/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/14/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/14/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/14/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/14/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/15/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/15/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/16/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/20/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/20/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/23/2005