Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/27/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/29/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/03/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/26/2006
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/23/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/24/2006
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/19/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/19/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/11/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/20/2006