Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 02/08/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/10/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/10/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/10/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/10/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/10/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/10/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/10/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/10/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/10/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/10/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/15/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/15/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/15/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/15/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/15/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 02/15/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/15/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/15/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 02/15/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/16/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/16/2005
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/16/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/16/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 02/16/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 02/17/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/17/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/17/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/17/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/01/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/01/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 03/01/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/01/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/07/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/07/2005