There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution supporting the continued administration of Channel Islands National Park, including Santa Rosa Island, in accordance with the laws (including regulations) and policies of the National Park Service.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/03/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8900; text as passed Senate: CR S8900)
07/31/2006Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-310.
05/04/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
08/03/2006Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8900; text as passed Senate: CR S8900)
07/31/2006Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
07/31/2006Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 109-310.
05/24/2006Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/16/2006Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 109-547.
05/04/2006Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4077)
05/04/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4077-4078)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/04/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/04/2006 Referred to
05/24/2006 Markup by
07/31/2006 Reported by S. Rept. 109-310
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks05/16/2006 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.Res.468.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.468. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (08/03/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

States that: (1) Channel Islands National Park, including Santa Rosa Island, should continue to be administered by the National Park Service (NPS); (2) the NPS should manage Santa Rosa Island in a manner that ensures that the natural, scenic, and cultural resources of the Island are properly protected, restored, and interpreted for the public and that visitors to the Park are provided with a safe and enjoyable Park experience; and (3) the NPS should not be directed to manage Santa Rosa Island in a manner that would result in the public being denied access to significant parts of the Island or that is inconsistent with the responsibility of NPS to protect native resources within the Park, including threatened and endangered species.