Text: S.Res.468 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (08/03/2006)


109th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. RES. 468


Supporting the continued administration of Channel Islands National Park, including Santa Rosa Island, in accordance with the laws (including regulations) and policies of the National Park Service.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

May 4, 2006

Mrs. Feinstein (for herself and Mrs. Boxer) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources

July 31, 2006

Reported by Mr. Domenici, without amendment

August 3, 2006

Considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Supporting the continued administration of Channel Islands National Park, including Santa Rosa Island, in accordance with the laws (including regulations) and policies of the National Park Service.

    Whereas Channel Islands National Monument was designated in 1938 by President Franklin D. Roosevelt under the authority of the Act of June 8, 1906 (16 U.S.C. 431 note);

    Whereas the Monument was expanded to include additional islands and redesignated as Channel Islands National Park in 1980 to protect the nationally significant natural, scenic, wildlife, marine, ecological, archaeological, cultural, and scientific values of the Channel Islands in California;

    Whereas Santa Rosa Island was acquired by the United States in 1986 for approximately $29,500,000 for the purpose of restoring the native ecology of the Island and making the Island available to the public for recreational uses;

    Whereas Santa Rosa Island contains numerous prehistoric and historic artifacts and provides important habitat for several threatened and endangered species;

    Whereas under a court-approved settlement, the nonnative elk and deer populations are scheduled to be removed from the Park by 2011 and the Island is to be restored to management consistent with other National Parks; and

    Whereas there have been recent proposals to remove Santa Rosa Island from the administration of the National Park Service or to direct the management of the Island in a manner inconsistent with existing legal requirements and the sound management of Park resources: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That—

(1) Channel Islands National Park, including Santa Rosa Island, should continue to be administered by the National Park Service in accordance with the National Park Service Organic Act (16 U.S.C. 1 et seq.) and other applicable laws;

(2) the National Park Service should manage Santa Rosa Island in a manner that ensures that—

(A) the natural, scenic, and cultural resources of the Island are properly protected, restored, and interpreted for the public; and

(B) visitors to the Park are provided with a safe and enjoyable Park experience; and

(3) the National Park Service should not be directed to manage Santa Rosa Island in a manner—

(A) that would result in the public being denied access to significant portions of the Island; or

(B) that is inconsistent with the responsibility of the National Park Service to protect native resources within the Park, including threatened and endangered species.


Share This