Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/25/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 05/25/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/25/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/09/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/22/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/10/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/11/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/14/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/26/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/03/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/05/2006