Summary: S.Res.50 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/17/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes expenditures by the following Senate committees from March 1, 2005, through September 30, 2005, October 1, 2005, through September 30, 2006 , and October 1, 2006, through February 28, 2007: (1) Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry; (2) Armed Services; (3) Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs; (4) Budget; (5) Commerce, Science, and Transportation; (6) Energy and Natural Resources; (7) Environment and Public Works; (8) Finance; (9) Foreign Relations; (10) Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs; (11) Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions; (12) Judiciary; (13) Rules and Administration; (14) Small Business and Entrepreneurship; (15) Veterans' Affairs; (16) Aging; (17) Intelligence; and (18) Indian Affairs.

Provides that within the funds in the account "Expenses of Inquiries and Investigations" appropriated by the legislative branch appropriations Acts for FY 2005, 2006, and 2007, there is authorized to be established a special reserve to be available to any committee to meet specified unpaid obligations or expenses.