Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/06/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/06/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/06/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/11/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/12/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/12/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/12/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/12/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 07/12/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/12/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/12/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 07/12/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/13/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/13/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/13/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/13/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/14/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/14/2006