Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/15/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/16/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/16/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/20/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/21/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/22/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/22/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/22/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/22/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/28/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/10/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/12/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/12/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 07/12/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/20/2006