Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 08/03/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 08/03/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/26/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/29/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/16/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/05/2006