Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 09/07/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 09/07/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/11/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/11/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/11/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/11/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/11/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/11/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/12/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/12/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/13/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/25/2006