There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution admonishing the statements made by President Hugo Chavez at the United Nations General Assembly on September 20, 2006, and the undemocratic actions of President Chavez.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/06/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 12/7/2006 S11388)
12/06/2006Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 12/7/2006 S11388-11389)
09/29/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
12/06/2006Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 12/7/2006 S11388)
12/06/2006Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 12/7/2006 S11388-11389)
09/30/2006Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S10756)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations09/30/2006 Referred to
12/06/2006 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.607. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/06/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Condemns: (1) the statements made by President Hugo Chavez at the U.N. General Assembly on September 20, 2006; and (2) the undemocratic actions of President Chavez.