Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/15/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/15/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/15/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/16/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/04/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/04/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/04/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/04/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/04/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/04/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/12/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 04/12/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/18/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/18/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/18/2005