Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/29/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/29/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/01/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/12/2007