Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/01/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/02/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/31/2007