Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/10/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/10/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/10/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/18/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/31/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/28/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/06/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/24/2007