There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Assault Weapons Ban and Law Enforcement Protection Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the assault weapons ban, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/13/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/19/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/13/2007Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/07/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/07/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/09/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/09/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/13/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/13/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/15/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/15/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/15/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/15/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/16/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/19/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/19/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/26/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/08/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/08/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/06/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/02/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/17/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/15/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/13/2007 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/19/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1022.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1022. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2007)

Assault Weapons Ban and Law Enforcement Protection Act of 2007 - Reinstates for ten years repealed criminal provisions regarding assault weapons and large capacity ammunition feeding devices (the assault weapons ban).

Revises the definition of "semiautomatic assault weapon" to include conversion kits (for converting a firearm to such a weapon) and any semiautomatic rifle or pistol that has an ability to accept a detachable magazine and that has specified characteristics, including a telescoping stock.

Prohibits the transfer of such a weapon except through a licensed dealer or a state or local law enforcement agency, subject to specified requirements. Directs the Attorney General to: (1) establish and maintain a record of the make, model, and date of manufacture of any such weapon which the Attorney General is made aware has been used in relation to a crime, and of the nature and circumstances of the crime involved; and (2) annually submit the record to Congress and make it available to the public.

Prohibits: (1) the transfer of any assault weapon with a large capacity ammunition feeding device; and (2) a licensed manufacturer, importer, or dealer who transfers such a device that was manufactured on or before this Act's enactment from failing to certify to the Attorney General, within 60 days of the transfer date, that the device was manufactured on or before that date. Sets forth penalties for violations.

Prohibits: (1) the transfer of such a weapon or device to a juvenile; and (2) the importation of such a device.