Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/07/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/07/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/09/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/09/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/13/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/13/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/15/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/15/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/15/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/15/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/16/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/19/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/19/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/26/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/08/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/08/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/06/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/02/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/17/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/15/2008