Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/17/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/30/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/24/2007