Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/27/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/26/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/26/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/26/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/25/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/11/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/26/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/16/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/12/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/18/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/29/2008