Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/14/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/16/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/16/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/01/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/07/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/07/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/07/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/19/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/18/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/24/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/24/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/11/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/26/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/05/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/05/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/01/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/10/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/16/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/05/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 12/11/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/15/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/25/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/04/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/06/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/10/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 03/10/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/10/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/13/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/31/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/31/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/15/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/22/2008