Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/14/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/14/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2007