Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/14/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/14/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/28/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/28/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/28/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/28/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/18/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/19/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/01/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/08/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/11/2007