Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/27/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/01/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/05/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/06/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/08/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/09/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/12/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/12/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/13/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/13/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/15/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/25/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/29/2007