Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/15/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/05/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/08/2008