Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/28/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/28/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/30/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/10/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/25/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/25/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/25/2007