Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/01/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/01/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/01/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/01/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/01/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/01/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/06/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/06/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/06/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/06/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/06/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/06/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/09/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/09/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/26/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/29/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/01/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/08/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/08/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/16/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/01/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 10/15/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/29/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/16/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/17/2008