Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/26/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 11/13/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/12/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/12/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/27/2008