Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/28/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/28/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/06/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/13/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/13/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/20/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/20/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/21/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/23/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/23/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/23/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/27/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/17/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/14/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/12/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/10/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/10/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/10/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/13/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/13/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/30/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/31/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 08/03/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/04/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/15/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/24/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/15/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/16/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/28/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/28/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/26/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/28/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/08/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/15/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/17/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/09/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/24/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/01/2008