Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/28/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/14/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/15/2007