Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/19/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/27/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/28/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/28/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/03/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/22/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/22/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/22/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/24/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/24/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/21/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/05/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/19/2007