Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/06/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/06/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/06/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/08/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/08/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/09/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/12/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/13/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/13/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/14/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/15/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/15/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/20/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/26/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/27/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/07/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/06/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/06/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/26/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/24/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/24/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/29/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/29/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/05/2008