Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/29/2007