Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/01/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/09/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/09/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/09/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/22/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/27/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/27/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/27/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/23/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/23/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/03/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/11/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/21/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/21/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/22/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/27/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/28/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/18/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/01/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/31/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/29/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/30/2008