Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/21/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/18/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/12/2007