Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/27/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/28/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/08/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/22/2007