Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/16/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/27/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/27/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/27/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/27/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/27/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/28/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/28/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/28/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/28/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/08/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/08/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/08/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/26/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/26/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/26/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/24/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/24/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/07/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/20/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/20/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/26/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/26/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/26/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/15/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/03/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/22/2008