Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/02/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/02/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/13/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/21/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/26/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/07/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/07/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/08/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/06/2008