Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/01/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/24/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/12/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/12/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/11/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/24/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/27/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/09/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/09/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/08/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/12/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/12/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/12/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/12/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/03/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/03/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/03/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/06/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/06/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/22/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/20/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 08/01/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 08/01/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/18/2008