Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/15/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/15/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/15/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/15/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/15/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/15/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/15/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/15/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/15/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/15/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/15/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/15/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/22/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/22/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/22/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/29/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/29/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/26/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/26/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/26/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/26/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/03/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/03/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/15/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/15/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/13/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/20/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/20/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/20/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/26/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/26/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/26/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/26/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/17/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/12/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/12/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/12/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/12/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/12/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/12/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/31/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/14/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/24/2008