Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/01/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/22/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/28/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/26/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/24/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/07/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/25/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/10/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/08/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/03/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/03/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008