Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/06/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/22/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/10/2007